KY HB50 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - posted in committee
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.17A-660 to define "classification of benefits" and "nonquantitative treatment limitation"; amend KRS 304.17A-661 to modify mental health parity requirements; require parity coverage for nonquantitative treatment limitations and medical necessity criteria; require compliance with nonquantitative treatment limitations set forth in federal law; require insurers to submit annual reports relating to the insurer's compliance with mental health parity requirements; amend KRS 304.17A-669 to remove exemptions; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mental health parity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-09-17HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback