KY HB5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 54-10)
Status: Passed on January 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 54-10)
Status: Passed on January 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate moneys to the West Kentucky State Aid Funding for Emergencies (SAFE) fund; create a new section of KRS Chapter 39A to create the West Kentucky SAFE fund; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters providing funding for disaster recovery and relief, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1952 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Waive 2nd and 3rd Reading RSN# 1951 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 24 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 23 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Waive 2nd and 3rd Reading RSN# 1951 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 24 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 23 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 2) |
2022-01-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-01-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-01-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | received in House |
2022-01-12 | Senate | passed 32-0 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 2nd and 3rd readings dispensed with |
2022-01-12 | Senate | substituted for identical Senate Bill 5 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 12, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-01-12 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-01-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-01-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 12, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | 1st reading |
2022-01-08 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Disasters
Effective Dates, Emergency
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Budget and Financial Administration
Disasters
Effective Dates, Emergency
Military Affairs and Civil Defense