KY HB5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new section of KRS Chapter 311 to prohibit an abortion if the pregnant woman is seeking the abortion, in whole or in part, because of an unborn child's sex, race, color, national origin, or disability, except in the case of a medical emergency; require physicians to certify a lack of knowledge that the pregnant woman's intent to seek an abortion was, in whole or in part, because of an unborn child's sex, race, color, national origin, or disability; require the State Board of Medical Licensure to revoke a physician's license to practice medicine if the physician violates the prohibition; provide that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services shall revoke the license of any person, including a licensed abortion facility, that violates the prohibition; provide that a physician who violates the prohibition is civilly liable; allow for severability; amend KRS 311.595 to allow the State Board of Medical Licensure to suspend or revoke the license of any physician who violates the prohibition; amend KRS 311.725, regarding informed consent for abortions, to notify pregnant women of the prohibition; amend KRS 311.990 to provide that a person who violates the prohibition is guilty of a Class D felony; amend KRS 213.101 to conform; amend KRS 413.140 to provide a one-year statute of limitations for civil actions arising from a violation of the prohibition; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the human rights of unborn children to not be discriminated against and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Roll call SFA 1 to HB 5 RSN# 956 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 957 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 145 (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19Housesigned by Governor
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housereceived in House
2019-03-13SenateBill passed 32-4
2019-03-13Senatefloor amendment (1) defeated
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-03-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-03-01Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 67-25 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed to bill
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Housereassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-01-11Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb5.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb5/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb5/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB5/HCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb5/HCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb5/HCS1LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB5/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB5/HFA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb5/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb5/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb5/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback