KY HB5 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to define certain terms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to require public agencies and nonaffiliated third parties to implement, maintain, and update security procedures and practices, including taking any appropriate corrective action to safeguard against security breaches; establish reasonable security and breach investigation procedures; include security and breach investigation procedures in contracts with nonaffiliated third parties; create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to require public agencies that maintain personal information to notify persons impacted by security breaches; notify specified officials of security breaches; specify how to provide notice of security breaches to impacted individuals; create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to require the Department for Libraries and Archives to establish procedures for the disposal and destruction of records that include personal information and require the legislative and judicial branches to follow Sections 1 to 4 of this Act; amend KRS 42.722 to define certain terms; amend KRS 42.726 to require the Commonwealth Office of Technology to develop a security framework relating to privacy and confidentiality of personal information and submit an annual report to the Legislative Research Commission regarding security breaches; amend KRS 42.732 to require the Commonwealth Office of Technology to receive specified advice on preventing security attacks; amend KRS 171.450 to require the Department for Libraries and Archives to establish procedures to protect against unauthorized access to personal information; amend KRS 171.680 to require public agencies to comply with the provisions of Sections 1 to 4 of this Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the safety and security of personal information held by public agencies.

Sponsors

Rep. Denver Butler [D]Rep. Sal Santoro [R]Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R]Rep. Rocky Adkins [D]
Rep. Johnny Bell [D]Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R]Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R]Rep. Regina Huff [R]
Rep. Thomas Burch [D]Rep. Dwight Butler [R]Rep. John Carney [R]Rep. Larry Clark [D]
Rep. Hubert Collins [D]Rep. Leslie Combs [D]Rep. Tim Couch [R]Rep. Will Coursey [D]
Rep. Jesse Crenshaw [D]Rep. Ron Crimm [R]Rep. Robert Damron [D]Rep. Jim DeCesare [R]
Rep. Mitchel Denham [D]Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D]Rep. Myron Dossett [R]Sen. C.B. Embry [R]
Rep. Joseph Fischer [R]Rep. Kelly Flood [D]Rep. James Glenn [D]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]
Rep. Jeff Greer [D]Rep. Keith Hall [D]Rep. Mike Harmon [R]Rep. Richard Heath [R]
Rep. Gary Herald [R]Rep. Dennis Horlander [D]Rep. Kenny Imes [R]Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]
Rep. James Kay [D]Rep. Dennis Keene [D]Rep. Kim King [R]Rep. Martha King [D]
Rep. Adam Koenig [R]Rep. Stan Lee [R]Rep. Jimmie Lee [D]Rep. Brian Linder [R]
Rep. Mary Marzian [D]Rep. Donna Mayfield [R]Rep. Thomas McKee [D]Rep. David Meade [R]
Rep. Reginald Meeks [D]Rep. Michael Meredith [R]Rep. Suzanne Miles [R]Rep. Charles Miller [D]
Rep. Terry Mills [D]Rep. Brad Montell [R]Rep. Tim Moore [R]Rep. David Osborne [R]
Rep. Sannie Overly [D]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]Rep. Ryan Quarles [R]Rep. Marie Rader [R]
Rep. Jody Richards [D]Rep. Steven Riggs [D]Rep. Tom Riner [D]Rep. Bart Rowland [R]
Rep. Arnold Simpson [D]Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D]Rep. Diane St Onge [R]Rep. Fitz Steele [D]
Rep. Jim Stewart [R]Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D]Rep. Thomas Thompson [D]Rep. John Tilley [D]
Rep. Tommy Turner [R]Rep. Ken Upchurch [R]Rep. Gerald Watkins [D]Rep. Jim Wayne [D]
Rep. Russell Webber [R]Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Addia Wuchner [R]Rep. Brent Yonts [D]
Rep. Jill York [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
2014-03-31Housedelivered to Governor
2014-03-31Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-03-28Housepassed 97-0
2014-03-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2014-03-27Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2014-03-27Housetaken from Rules
2014-03-24Houseto Rules (H)
2014-03-24Housereceived in House
2014-03-21Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-03-20Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014
2014-03-19Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2014-03-18Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-02-04Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2014-01-31Senatereceived in Senate
2014-01-30House3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute
2014-01-28Houseplaced in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2014
2014-01-28Housetaken from Rules (H)
2014-01-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-01-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-01-21Houseposted in committee
2014-01-13Houseto State Government (H)
2014-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback