KY HB498 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.032 to require the Finance and Administration Cabinet, in conjunction with the State Treasurer, to provide public access to executive branch financial information; require express written approval of both the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet and the State Treasurer for any contract for development of a Web site providing public access to executive branch expenditures.
Title
AN ACT relating to transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 217 (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-24 |
2020-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | introduced in House |