KY HB498 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Rename the United States Department of Veterans Affairs throughout the Kentucky Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 42)
2017-03-08Housedelivered to Governor
2017-03-08Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-07Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-06Housereceived in House
2017-03-06Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2017-03-06Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 6, 2017
2017-03-03Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-02Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-02-27Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2017-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-24House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2017-02-23Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017
2017-02-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-02-21Houseposted in committee
2017-02-21Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2017-02-17Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback