KY HB495 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.160 to require cursive writing to be taught in elementary schools beginning with the 2018-2019 academic year.
Title
AN ACT relating to student writing.
Sponsors
Rep. Jill York [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Donna Mayfield [R] | Rep. Wesley Morgan [R] |
Rep. Diane St Onge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB495.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB495/bill.pdf |