KY HB489 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.050, to require that voluntary donations for the agricultural program trust fund accompanying farm vehicle registrations be listed separately on any notices and that the voluntary contribution not be automatically added to the cost of registration; amend KRS 186.164 to require that voluntary donations accompanying any special license plate be listed separately on any notices and that the voluntary contribution not be automatically added to the cost of registration.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | recommitted to Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | to Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-09 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-08 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2010-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 8, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-24 | to Transportation (H) | |
2010-02-23 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB489.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB489/bill.doc |