KY HB487 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Allow a local board of education in a district that missed 20 or more instructional days during the 2009-2010 school year to request the commissioner of education to waive the makeup of instructional days missed beyond 20 days, up to a maximum of 10 days, including waiver of makeup days beyond 20 days scheduled in the district's approved calendar; require the commissioner to approve the request; require all staff to make up waived days; identify activities to be used by staff to make up days. EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to school calendars and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-04-01 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-29 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-29 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-29 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-26 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-26 | received in House | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 36-1-1 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-03-25 | returned to Education (S) | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-25 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-24 | returned to Education (S) | |
2010-03-24 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-24 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-22 | to Education (S) | |
2010-03-18 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 81-16 | |
2010-03-18 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-24 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-23 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB487.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB487/bill.doc |