KY HB483 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - WITHDRAWN
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - WITHDRAWN
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 7 to implement a suggestion system for legislative branch employees.
Title
AN ACT relating to employee incentives for legislative branch employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-26 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-26 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-26 | WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-16 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-24 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-02-23 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB483.htm |