KY HB48 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 6.145 to 6.237 to allow individuals who become members of the General Assembly on or after April 1, 2018, to make a one-time irrevocable election to not participate in the Legislators' Retirement Plan or the Kentucky Employees Retirement System for their service to the General Assembly; allow members of the General Assembly who began contributing to the Legislators' Retirement Plan or the Kentucky Employees Retirement System on or after December 31, 2014, but prior to April 1, 2018, to make a one-time irrevocable election by December 31, 2018, to discontinue participation in the Legislators' Retirement Plan or the Kentucky Employees Retirement System for their service to the General Assembly and receive a refund of accumulated contributions; provide that the election to not participate or discontinue participation in the Legislators' Retirement Plan or the Kentucky Employees Retirement System applies to all future service of the General Assembly; amend KRS 6.505, 61.510, and 61.525 to conform; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to retirement benefit participation for members of the General Assembly and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02Houseto State Government (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-09-28HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback