KY HB470 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.190 to have a license plate of a transferred motor vehicle stay with the original owner to be placed on a subsequent vehicle purchase, set forth procedures to require that plates not immediately placed on another vehicle be held by the plate owner, keep the plate valid for the period of current registration, after which time the plate is canceled; exempt dealer transfers; amend KRS 186.045 to set forth procedures for repossessed vehicles; amend KRS 186A.100 to conform; effective January 1, 2013.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-24 | recommitted to Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-09 | to Transportation (S) | |
2010-03-05 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 | |
2010-03-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-24 | to Transportation (H) | |
2010-02-22 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB470.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB470/bill.doc |