KY HB47 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.078 to allow a Class D felony record to be expunged under specified circumstances; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to require the Administrative Office of the Courts to keep a confidential index of expungement orders for the preparation of presentence investigations; amend KRS 527.040, relating to possession of a firearm by a felon, to exempt individuals who have had their felony records expunged.
Title
AN ACT relating to expungement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-19 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 8, 2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | posting waived |
2013-01-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |