KY HB468 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.501 to direct the Kentucky Department of Education to recommend procedures for routine and emergency situations in which a child with a chronic health conditions such as diabetes, asthma, severe allergies, and epilepsy, experiences a health episode that necessitates leaving the classroom or other school setting to obtain treatment; require school staff to ensure adult escort to a school office for treatment.
Title
AN ACT relating to children with chronic health conditions in school.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-22 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-19 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB468.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB468/bill.doc |