KY HB44 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 228)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 159.035 to require a local school district's attendance policy to include provisions for a student's mental or behavioral health status.
Title
AN ACT relating to local school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 569 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2374 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2317 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 29 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2374 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2317 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 29 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 228) |
2022-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-14 | House | passed 95-0 |
2022-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2022-04-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2022-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-14 | House | received in House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | passed 30-3 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-3 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2022-01-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-08-04 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |