KY HB436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 135)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 324.085 to include an exemption from the annual continuing education requirement for licensees completing post-licensing education; require licensees to complete 9 classroom or online hours of continuing education each year; require 3 of the 9 continuing education hours to be in real estate law; amend KRS 324.090 to require licenses to expire and be renewed biennially; amend KRS 324.287 to place a $60 cap on the biennial original finance fee; place a $60 cap on the renewal license fee; establish and place a $200 cap on the prelicensing education course review fee; establish and place a $50 cap on the continuing and postlicensing education course review fee; establish and place a $75 cap on the distance education course review fee; eliminate request for change fee; amend KRS 324.310 to change escrow to inactive status; require candidates to submit a criminal record check consistent with KRS 324.045(4); amend KRS 324.330 to eliminate reference to the change fee; amend KRS 324.395 to mandate all required insurance to contain extended reporting period coverage; establish a $200 cap on coverage for the group policy the commission is required to obtain for licensees; amend KRS 324.400 to change the annual renewal to biennially; place a $60 cap on the biennial renewal fee; amend KRS 324.420 to reduce the statute of limitations for filing complaints with the commission from two years to one; amend KRS 413.140 to include real estate licensees in the one-year statute of limitations for professional liability; amend KRS 198B.724 to allow the board to accept up to 6 hours of continuing education in real estate; amend KRS 324A.045 to allow the board to accept up to 6 hours of continuing education in real estate; amend KRS 330.070 to allow the board to accept up to 6 hours of continuing education in real estate; repeal KRS 324A.060; Sections 1 and 2 of this Act EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to professions licensed by the Real Estate Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Scott Lewis [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
Rep. Jason Nemes [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] |
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1052 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 239 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 239 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 135) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-01 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-20 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | introduced in House |