KY HB432 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 281 to establish safety requirements for railroad employee contract carriers; define "railroad employee contract carrier" as a passenger vehicle that transports 8 or less railroad employees; require contract carrier to maintain a driver qualification file, including physical examination and physical ability of driver, review of driving record, record of traffic violations, application for employment, and driver's license; require disqualification of driver with 2 or more serious traffic violations within a 3 year period; establish a rail carrier driver's maximum hours of service; require prescreening of rail carrier driver for drugs and alcohol and post-accident testing; require inspection, maintenance, and retention of records related to inspection, maintenance, and repair of vehicle; authorize access by Transportation Cabinet to facility and records to determine compliance; require contract carrier to maintain insurance policy of $5 million; establish maximum penalty of $1,000 for violation; provide appeal procedure including a hearing under KRS Chapter 13B; permit a railroad to rely on a rail carrier's certification that it complies with the requirements of the Act without further inquiry.
Title
AN ACT relating to employee safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-24 | returned to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-24 | taken from the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-04 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2010 | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-19 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-18 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2010-02-16 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB432.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB432/bill.doc |