KY HB43 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 82)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 39A.100 to exclude houses of worship from emergency condemnation authority; prohibit a governmental entity from prohibiting religious services during an emergency to a greater extent than imposed on other organizations or businesses that provide essential services; require a compelling governmental interest to place a burden on a religious organization; prohibit a governmental entity from taking any discriminatory action against a religious organization on the basis that the organization is religious; define "discriminatory action," "governmental entity," "religious organization," and "religious services"; allow a religious organization to assert a violation of this section as a claim against a governmental entity or as a defense and waive sovereign, governmental, and qualified immunity to the extent of liability under the section; set out remedies available to a religious organization; require construciton in favor of protecting free exercise of religion; require a religious organization to bring an action no later than two years from the date the person should have known of the discriminatory action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to religious freedom during a declared emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2194 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 193 (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-05Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 82)
2022-03-24Housedelivered to Governor
2022-03-24Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2022-03-24Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2022-03-24Housereceived in House
2022-03-23Senate3rd reading, passed 30-7
2022-03-21Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022
2022-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2022-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-03-09Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2022-03-02Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2022-03-01House3rd reading, passed 83-12 with Committee Substitute (1) Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
2022-02-28Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2022-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022
2022-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
2022-02-23Houseto State Government (H)
2022-01-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-04Houseintroduced in House
2021-08-04HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback