KY HB428 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 222 to provide for an opioid assessment detention at an appropriate medical facility when a person has had an opioid overdose and been treated with naloxone or another opioid overdose intervention drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to opioid overdose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 369 (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-03-21Senate1st reading
2018-03-21Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2018-03-21Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-20House3rd reading, passed 92-3 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2018-03-19Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-15Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-15Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-09Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-03-06Houseposted in committee
2018-02-23Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-02-21Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback