KY HB425 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of KRS Chapters 83A, 116, 117, 118, 118A, 119, 120, 242, and 424 relating to paper ballots, voting equipment, voting systems, and elections; repeal KRS 117.381 and 117.387, relating to electronic voting systems.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-22 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Counties
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Counties
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies