KY HB424 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - returned to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - returned to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.107 to allow a waiver or modification of the statewide assessment system for schools participating in a district of innovation plan, under specific conditions; allow a district of innovation to use student assessments other than those required by the state board, under specific conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to districts of innovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2014-02-26 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | posting waived |
2014-02-24 | House | to Education (H) |
2014-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB424.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB424/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB424/vote_history.pdf |