KY HB420 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various KRS sections to provide that guardians ad litem and court-appointed counsel shall receive a fee not to exceed $500 and to specify the payors of those fees; amend KRS 625.0405, 625.041, and 625.080 to provide that the appointment of guardians ad litem and court-appointed counsel for voluntary or involuntary termination of parental rights proceedings shall solely be for representation at the trial level and shall not extend to the filing of an appeal nor to the appeal process; clarify that only private attorneys appointed to represent those alleged to be mentally ill shall receive a representation fee; provide that guardians ad litems and court-appointed counsel appointed to represent minors and disabled adults in guardianship or conservatorship hearings receive a reasonable fee; specify that if the respondent is indigent, the attorney shall receive a fee not to exceed $500; clarify that attorneys appointed in a DVO or IPO proceeding to represent a minor or an adult who is incarcerated shall be paid by the Finance and Administration Cabinet; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to guardians ad litem and other court-appointed counsel and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 189 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-1 |
2021-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |