KY HB401 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7881 to allow a student who receives an undergraduate degree prior to using eight semesters of KEES eligibility to use the remaining semesters of KEES eligibility toward a graduate degree program.
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky educational excellence scholarships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-02-12 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB401.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB401/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB401/FN.pdf |