KY HB392 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 12.020 to create the Office of the Kentucky Workforce Innovation Board, Foundation for Adult Education, Office of Administrative Services, Division of Operations and Support Services, Division of Fiscal Management, Division of Kentucky Business Enterprise, Division of the Carl D. Perkins Vocational Training Center, Division of Blind Services, Division of Field Services, Statewide Council for Vocational Rehabilitation, Office of Unemployment Insurance, Office of Employer and Apprenticeship Services, Office of Career Development, Office of Adult Education, Unemployment Insurance Commission; remove the Office of Budget and Administration, Division of Administrative Services, Office for the Blind, Office of Employment and Training, Division of Grant Management and Support, Division of Workforce and Employment Services, Division of Unemployment Insurance, Kentucky Office for the Blind State Rehabilitation Council, Statewide Council for Vocational Rehabilitation, Unemployment Insurance Commission, and the Division of Apprenticeship; amend KRS 12.023 to remove the Foundation for Adult Education; amend KRS 14A.7-030, 205.178, and 341.410 to change division to office; amend KRS 41.410 to replace Office for the Blind with Division of Blind Services; amend KRS 42.4592 to replace the Office of Employment and Training with the Department of Workforce Investment; amend KRS 45A.470 to replace Office for the Blind with Office of Vocational Rehabilitation; amend KRS 132.193 and 132.195 to replace Office for the Blind with Division of Kentucky Business Enterprise; amend KRS 141.0205, 158.146, and 164.0207 to conform; amend KRS 141.065 to replace Office of Employment and Training with Office of Unemployment Insurance; amend KRS 151B.020 to establish the Office of Unemployment Insurance, Office of Employer and Apprenticeship Services, Office of Career Development, and Office of Adult Education; remove the Office for the Blind and the Office of Employment and Training; amend KRS 151B.185 to organize newly created offices; amend KRS 151B.245 to organize and define the newly created Statewide Council for Vocational Rehabilitation; amend KRS 151B.280 to replace the Office of Employment and Training with the Office of Unemployment Insurance; create and define the Offices of Employer and Apprenticeship Services, Career Development, and Adult Education; amend KRS 154.10-050, 154.12-2084, 154.20-150, 154.20-170, 154.22-010, 154.22-040, 154.23-010, 154.23-015, 154.24-010, 154.28-010, 154.32-050, and 439.179 to remove the Office of Employment and Training; amend KRS 156.848 to change vice president to executive director; amend KRS 158.360 and 164.035 to replace the Kentucky Adult Education Program with the Office of Adult Education; amend KRS 158.842 to replace vice president with secretary; amend KRS 161.011 to replace Council on Postsecondary Education with the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; amend KRS 161.220 to add information about employees of the Office of Adult Education; amend KRS 163.460 to replace Office for the Blind with Office of Vocational Rehabilitation; delete references to Kentucky Office for the Blind State Rehabilitation Council; amend KRS 163.475, 163.480, 163.487, and 163.489 to remove Office for the Blind; amend KRS 163.489 to replace Office for the Blind State Rehabilitation Council with Statewide Council for Vocational Rehabilitation; repeal KRS 164.006 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; repeal KRS 164.0062 and 164.0064 and reenact as new sections of KRS Chapter 151B; replace Kentucky Adult Education Program with the Office of Adult Education; replace Council on Postsecondary Education with Department of Workforce Investment; repeal KRS 164.007 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; replace Investment Act of 1998 with Innovation and Opportunity Act; amend KRS 164.020 to delete requirements for adult education; amend KRS 164.0203 to replace Kentucky Adult Education Program with Office of Adult Education; repeal KRS 164.023 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; create and organize the Office of Adult Education; repeal KRS 164.0232 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; replace president of the council with secretary of the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; repeal KRS 164.0234 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; replace Kentucky Adult Education Program with Office of Adult Education; repeal KRS 164.041 and reenact as a new section of KRS Chapter 151B; replace council with Education and Workforce Development Cabinet; replace Kentucky Adult Education Program with the Office of Adult Education; replace the Kentucky Office of Employment and Training with the Department of Workforce Investment; amend KRS 164.477 to replace Office for the Blind with Division of Blind Services and Office of Vocational Rehabilitation; amend KRS 186.576 and 186.578 to replace Office for the Blind with Office of Vocational Rehabilitation; amend KRS 336.020 to remove Division of Apprenticeship; amend KRS 341.145 to remove the Office of Employment and Training; amend KRS 341.243, 341.250, 341.260, 341.270, 341.300, 341.360, 341.415, 341.440, 341.470, 341.530, 341.540, and 341.990 to replace Office of Employment and Training with Office of Unemployment Insurance; amend KRS 342.0011, 342.122, and 342.710 to replace Office of Employment and Training with Department of Workforce Investment; amend KRS 342.122 to remove Division of Apprenticeship; amend KRS 342.732 and 533.210 to replace Kentucky Adult Education Program with Office of Adult Education; transfer funds to Office of Adult Education; delay transfer of funds relating to the Adult Education and Family Literacy Act until the United States Department of Education approves the grant transfer; confirm in part Executive Order 2018-597; confirm Executive Orders 2018-779, 2019-026, and 2019-027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1031 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 185 (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 59-37 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-28Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-20Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2019-02-15Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback