KY HB380 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 365 to define "boundaries of the Commonwealth" "goods" and "produced"; remove from federal jurisdiction all goods that are produced or manufactured within the Commonwealth of Kentucky if those goods are retained or remain in Kentucky and do not move through interstate commerce; affirm that jurisdiction by the United States Congress or federal authorities under the Commerce Clause of the United States Constitution are inapplicable to goods produced in the Commonwealth of Kentucky even from the standpoint of the good's materials or parts; require stamping of intrastate goods that will be eligible under the Act; and apply the Act only to those goods produced after July 15, 2012.
Title
AN ACT relating to intrastate manufacture or production of goods of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Dewayne Bunch [R] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Hubert Collins [D] |
Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Jim DeCesare [R] | Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. David Housman [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. John Short [D] | Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D] |
Rep. John Stacy [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-09 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2011-02-08 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB380.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB380/bill.doc |