KY HB38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 319 to enact and enter into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact with all other jurisdictions that legally join the compact; declare the purpose of the compact; define terms; allow a psychologist to hold one or more compact state licenses at a time; recognize the right of a psychologist licensed in the compact to practice telepsychology in other compact states where the psychologist is not licensed; establish conditions under which a psychologist licensed to practice in a compact state can practice telepsychology; establish the conditions under which a psychologist licensed to practice in a compact state may be granted a temporary authorization to practice; authorize a home state to take adverse action against a psychologist's license issued by the home state; allow a receiving state to take adverse action on a psychologist's authority to practice interjurisdictional telepsychology within that receiving state; authorize a compact state's ability to issue subpoenas for hearings and investigation as well as cease and desist and injunctive relief orders to revoke a psychologist's authority to practice interjurisdictional telepsychology and temporary authorization to practice; establish the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Commission; require the commission to provide for and maintain a Coordinated Licensure Information System (Coordinated Database) and reporting system containing licensure and disciplinary action information on psychologists participating in the compact; provide immunity for members, officers, executive director, employees and representatives of the commission who act in accordance with the provisions of the compact; authorize the commission to establish rulemaking procedures; authorize the executive, judicial, and legislative branches of state government to enforce the provisions of the compact; affirm that rules promulgated will have standing as statutory law; require provisions of the compact to become effective on the date the compact is enacted into law in the seventh compact state.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 319 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1663 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1663 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 46) |
2021-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | passed 94-0 |
2021-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-09-15 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Health and Medical Services
Interstate Cooperation
Licensing
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions
Health and Medical Services
Interstate Cooperation
Licensing
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions