KY HB377 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 164 to establish the Teacher Recruitment Student Loan Forgiveness Pilot Program; define eligibility for the program; direct the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the program; provide monetary awards for student loan repayment for eligible students who complete qualified teaching service; establish the Teacher Recruitment Student Loan Forgiveness Pilot Program fund; establish the Student Teacher Stipend Program; define eligibility for the program; direct the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the program; provide an award of up to $5,000 to an eligible student teacher; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to teacher recruitment and retention, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Beverly Chester-Burton [D] | Rep. Mike Clines [R] |
Rep. Killian Timoney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3137 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 247 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 247 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-25 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
State Agencies
Teachers
Appropriations
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Emergency
State Agencies
Teachers