KY HB368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.149)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.149)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 69.360 to require certification of county detectives in all counties and give uniform powers; amend KRS 15.380 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to county detectives.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meade [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1027 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.149) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a Consent bill |
2019-02-25 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2019-02-25 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-15 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | introduced in House |