KY HB367 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 151B.285 to mandate that public employment offices be located and operational in specified locations when the local workforce area has an unemployment rate above five percent.
Title
AN ACT relating to state employment offices and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 175 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2021-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2-title) filed |
2021-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | introduced in House |