KY HB36 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section in KRS Chapter 132 to exempt veteran service organizations from ad valorem taxation if over fifty percent of the organization's annual net income is expended on behalf of veterans and other charitable causes; amend KRS 132.010 to define veteran service organization; apply to property assessed on or after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to property taxes for veteran service organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11Houseposted in committee
2020-01-16Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-09Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-08-16HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback