KY HB358 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 61.510 to 61.705 to provide that postsecondary education institutions may voluntarily cease participation in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System (KERS) by paying the actuarial costs of ceasing participation; require institutions to file request to cease participation by December 31, 2019; define "postsecondary institutions" as Eastern Kentucky University, Kentucky State University, Morehead State University, Murray State University, Northern Kentucky University, Western Kentucky University, the Kentucky Community Technical College System, and the Kentucky Higher Education Student Loan Corporation; set actuarial costs for institutions ceasing participation to assumptions in the 2018 actuarial valuation and provide that the institution may pay off the costs over a period not to exceed 25 years at an interest rate of 5.25% per annum; provide that existing employees of a postsecondary institution ceasing participation may, subject to a favorable private letter ruling, elect to continue participating in the system; amend KRS 61.510, 61.520, 61.525, 61.543, and 61.560 to conform; provide that the KERS employer contribution rate shall be 49.47% of pay in FY 2019-2020 for Regional Mental Health Programs, Local and District Health Departments, domestic violence shelters, rape crisis centers, child advocacy centers, state supported universities and community colleges, and any other agency eligible to voluntarily cease participating in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System pursuant to KRS 61.522; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Employees Retirement System and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 404 (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Adopt FCC 1 RCS# 403 (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 1126 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 973 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 161 (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 160 (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseVetoed
2019-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-28HouseBill passed 58-39
2019-03-28Houseposted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report
2019-03-28Housereceived in House
2019-03-28SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2019-03-28SenateBill passed 26-11
2019-03-28SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2019-03-28SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in Senate
2019-03-28SenateFree Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2019-03-28SenateConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2019-03-28SenateConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2019-03-28SenateConference Committee appointed in House and Senate
2019-03-28SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-28Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-13Housereceived in House
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading, passed 25-12 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-04Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-27House3rd reading, passed 76-21 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-02-27Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) filed to bill
2019-02-26Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-19Housereturned to State Government (H)
2019-02-19House1st reading
2019-02-19Housetaken from State Government (H)
2019-02-14Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback