KY HB354 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 314.042 to require that advanced practice registered nurses exempted from a CAPA-NS include certified nurse practitioners, certified nurse midwifes, and certified registered nurse anesthetists; allow the CAPA-CS to include limitations on drugs and amounts and requirements for the APRN to communicate with the physician before prescribing; establish conditions for an APRN to prescribe controlled substances without a CAPA-CS after four years of controlled substance prescribing authority under a CAPA-CS; require an APRN to confirm with the nursing board that the APRN's license is in good standing before prescribing without a CAPA-CS; set procedures for the nursing board's license review, including promulgation of administrative regulations; exempt an equivalently qualified out-of-state APRN from the CAPA-CS requirement to prescribe under licensure by endorsement; prohibit an APRN from prescribing controlled substances without a CAPA-CS until the board has completed its review and notified the APRN in writing; create a new section of KRS Chapter 194A to create the Controlled Substance Prescribing Boards Advisory Council within the Office of the Inspector General; establish membership of the board; require meetings to discuss matters relating to the prescribing on controlled substances; require annual report.
Title
AN ACT relating to prescriptive authority and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 266 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 265 (Y: 21 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 264 (Y: 25 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 265 (Y: 21 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 55) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 264 (Y: 25 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-11 | House | floor amendments (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | 1st reading |
2022-01-26 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Boards and Commissions
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners