KY HB353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to divulge state tax records or information pursuant to court orders or subpoenas issued by a court of competent jurisdiction, or by a grand jury, in the prosecution of a state or federal crime.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disclosure of state tax records in criminal prosecutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2013-02-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-13 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | introduced in House |