KY HB346 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.712 to establish that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, working in agreements with financial institutions, shall operate a data match system related to child support payments and establish that the requirements for the financial institutions regarding the data match system are detailed in referenced statutes; amend KRS 205.778 to establish authority for the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to identify financial accounts of parents who have failed to make child support payments and allow the cabinet to take action against those accounts; amend KRS 205.792 to properly reference an established range of statutes; amend KRS 405.465 and 405.467 to make a technical language change.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-25 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 93-6 | |
2011-02-23 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | posting waived | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-07 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB346.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB346/bill.doc |