KY HB345 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 304.14-500 to 304.14-550 to prohibit certain trade practices relating to the sale of Medicare supplement policies to certain applicants; amend KRS 304.14-520 to conform; apply provisions to Medicare supplement policies available, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024; require insurers and the Department of Insurance to take regulatory actions necessary to ensure applications are available on or before January 1, 2024; EFFECTIVE, in part, January 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicare supplement insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2773 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 191 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 191 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 182) |
2023-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | House | received in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-15 | Senate | returned to Health Services (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | taken from Health Services (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | returned to Health Services (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | taken from Health Services (S) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-1 |
2023-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 09, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-01 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Aged Persons and Aging
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
State Agencies
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
State Agencies