KY HB339 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 341 to prevent a worker from receiving unemployment benefits in successive benefit years unless the worker has returned to work and earned 5 times his weekly benefit rate received in the prior benefit year.
Title
AN ACT relating unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-03 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-02 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2011 | |
2011-03-01 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-28 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2011-02-25 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2011-02-18 | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 | |
2011-02-11 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-07 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2011-02-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB339.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB339/bill.doc |