KY HB338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - returned to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - returned to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7874 to add proprietary institutions to KEES eligible institutions; define proprietary institution.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 136 (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-17 |
2021-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | introduced in House |