KY HB338 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 83A.060 relating to ordinances to specify that new language in an ordinance shall be underlined and language intended to be deleted shall be bracketed and stricken-through; and amend KRS 91A.040 to allow copies of the audits due the Department for Local Government and the Legislative Research Commission to be either paper or in an electronic format.
Title
AN ACT relating to municipal procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 96) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | passed 90-4 |
2013-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2013-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2013-03-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2013-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-13 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | introduced in House |