KY HB33 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 157.455 deleting the Kentucky efficient school design trust fund; delete reporting requirement for efficient design; amend KRS 198B.060 to allow local plan review, inspection and enforcement of educational facilities; repeal KRS 162.062, which requires new public school buildings to provide sufficient water bottle fillings station and drinking fountains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
2022-01-20House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-01-19Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-01-12Houseto Local Government (H)
2022-01-04Houseintroduced in House
2021-07-06HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback