KY HB329 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.705 to require the State Treasurer to either revise, cancel, or keep effective any contract in which the Government Contract Review Committee issues nonbinding recommendations; require the Treasurer to submit contract revisions pursuant to the committee's nonbinding recommendations to the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet or designee; require the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet or designee to either issue the contract with the Treasurer's revisions or cancel the contract; require the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet or designee to revise, cancel, or keep effective any contract issued pursuant to the Governor's constitutional powers in which the committee has issued a nonbinding recommendation; provide severability clause; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to government contract review and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Rep. Matthew Koch [R] | Rep. Michael Pollock [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2738 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 332 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2693 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 140 (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 332 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2693 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 140 (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 141) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2023-03-29 | House | passed 34 -2 |
2023-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2023-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2023-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | passed 79-19 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2023-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2023-03-29 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2023-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2023-03-24 | House | Vetoed |
2023-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | received in House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37 -0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-14 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-20 |
2023-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | to State Government (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | introduced in House |