KY HB32 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 211.760 to require tattoo facilities to conspicuously display a notice in a prominent place easily seen by patrons; set minimum dimensions of notice sign at 11 by 14 inches with 1 inch letters; direct the cabinet to supply the sign to the tattoo facilities; require the notice to warn that any tattoo on the neck, forearm, or lower leg automatically disqualifies the wearer from military service in the United States Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to qualifications for military service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-23 recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2012-03-23 taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2012-02-22 floor amendment (3) filed
2012-01-18 floor amendment (2) filed
2012-01-17 floor amendment (1) filed
2012-01-12 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 17, 2012
2012-01-12 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-01-11 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2012-01-09 posted in committee
2012-01-03 to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H)
2012-01-03 introduced in House
2012-10-05 To: Interim Joint Committee on Licensing and Occupations

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback