KY HB319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 164 to establish the Kentucky Cybersecurity (KentuckyCYBER) Program and governing board within the Council on Postsecondary Education; establish the purpose and duties of KentuckyCYBER Governing Board; create the KentuckyCYBER fund; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the KentuckyCYBER Program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Imes [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 184 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 29, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-15 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Economic Development
Education, Higher
Fiscal Note
Information Technology
Local Government
Public Protection
Safety
State Agencies
Technology
Telecommunications
Workforce
Economic Development
Education, Higher
Fiscal Note
Information Technology
Local Government
Public Protection
Safety
State Agencies
Technology
Telecommunications
Workforce