KY HB319 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 161 to implement the Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact; create a new section of KRS Chapter 160 requiring exit surveys from school personnel leaving employment; require the Kentucky Department of Education to develop a system for reporting exit survey data; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to direct the Council on Postsecondary Education to develop a marketing program to promote the teaching profession; require CPE to provide a report on the status of the program to the Interim Joint Committee on Education by November 1, 2024; establish a trust fund for the marketing program; create a new section of KRS Chapter 160 to direct the Kentucky Department of Education to create an online statewide job posting system for school job openings, if funds are available; amend KRS 160.380 to conform; amend KRS 164.769 to revise requirements for the Teacher Scholarship program; require the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to submit an annual program report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education; amend KRS 161.048 to require the Education Professional Standards Board to establish a process for candidates to obtain an eligible for hire letter; direct the Kentucky Department of Education to expand the GoTeachKY ambassador program to all school districts, as funds are available; require the Kentucky Department of Education to review the alternative pathway teacher certification options and processes to identify areas for improvement; require KDE to present its findings to the Interim Joint Committee on Education by October 1, 2023; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Jared Bauman [R] | Rep. Beverly Chester-Burton [D] | Rep. Daniel Grossberg [D] |
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 371 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2763 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2763 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 164) |
2023-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-30 | House | passed 99-0 |
2023-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-30 | House | received in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2023-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2023-03-15 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-24 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-17 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Compacts, Interstate
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Teachers
Compacts, Interstate
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Teachers