KY HB319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 171 to establish the Kentucky Civil War site preservation fund and allow the Kentucky Heritage Council to provide grants from the moneys deposited in the fund to private nonprofit organizations for the purchase of certain sites; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to historical preservation of Revolutionary War battlefields, Civil War battlefields, and Underground Railroad sites, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1292 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 142 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 142 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 11) |
2020-03-10 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-10 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | received in House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-20 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-29 | House | reassigned to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-01-24 | House | introduced in House |