KY HB312 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7531 to end the Best in Class, Best in Care, and Best in Law programs by June 30, 2018; amend KRS 164.769 to allow teacher scholarship recipients who teach dual credit coursework in a high school to receive two semesters of teacher scholarship promissory note cancellation for each semester spent teaching.
Title
AN ACT relating to student financial assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 40) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-14 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB312.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB312/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB312/vote_history.pdf |