KY HB312 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 16.191 to require that pay for Commercial Vehicle Enforcement officers be equivalent to pay for Kentucky State Police officers with the equivalent rank, grade, and position.
Title
AN ACT relating to wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-02-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-01 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB312.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB312/bill.pdf |
Amendment | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB312/HFA1.pdf |