KY HB308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 136 to establish the Kentucky Rural Jobs Act of 2022, allowing the Department of Revenue to begin accepting applications from entities seeking approval as a growth fund and allowing no more than $15 million dollars of insurance premiums tax credit to be awarded; amend KRS 131.190 to allow reporting of the tax credit to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; provide that Sections 1 to 10 of this Act may be cited as the Kentucky Rural Jobs Act of 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to the establishment of a grant program to promote investments in Kentucky businesses, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 417 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-4 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-29 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-02-01 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |