KY HB308 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various sections of KRS Chapter 15 and KRS 95A.250, relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program fund and the Firefighters Foundation Program fund, to increase the annual supplement payment to local governments for qualifying law enforcement officers and firefighters from $3,000 to $4,000 in 2016 and $4,500 in 2018; provide a reimbursement to local governments to fully reimburse for required contributions to the employee pension system resulting from the supplement increase; provide partial compensation for local government administrative expenses; amend KRS 95A.262 to increase the annual allocation to volunteer fire departments from the Commission on Fire Protection Personnel Standards and Education from $8,250 to $11,000 in 2016 and $12,000 in 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to public employee incentive pay programs and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Riggs [D] | Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] |
Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] |
Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] |
Rep. Terry Mills [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB308.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB308/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB308/LM.doc |