KY HB307 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.48-090 and 304.50-055 to define "nationally recognized statistical rating organization" and establish permissible investments for liability self-insurance groups and workers' compensation self-insurance groups.
Title
AN ACT relating to liability and workers' compensation self-insurance group investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2211 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 62) |
2022-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-25 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Bonds, Public
Cities
Corporations
Counties
Insurance
Local Government
Local Mandate
Securities
State Agencies
Workers' Compensation
Cities
Corporations
Counties
Insurance
Local Government
Local Mandate
Securities
State Agencies
Workers' Compensation