KY HB304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - floor amendment (2) filed
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-25 - floor amendment (2) filed
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.191 to ensure parental rights and involvement by requiring notification within two business days of specific events; require a district to adopt procedures that both encourage students to speak with parents and require facilitation of the discussion with parents; forbid a district or school from adopting policies that keep any student information confidential from parents or refuse information requested by a parent with specific exceptions; forbid a district from requiring school personnel or students to use nonconforming pronouns for any individual instead of just students, establish the type of mental health services that the section does not prohibit a district from seeking for students; amend KRS 158.1415 to prohibit a child in any grade level from receiving instruction on a specific topic a parent has provided written notice to the school asserting an objection due to religious or moral beliefs; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to establish a cause of action for violations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to prohibit a disciplinary action or adverse employment action for an employee informing a parent of specific information about a student or declining to use a pronoun or title inconsistent with the individual's biological sex; amend KRS 158.193 to establish that a school employee may participate in voluntary, student-initiated, student-led prayer when invited to do so; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2024-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-01-25 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parental Rights
Personnel and Employment
Religion
Teachers
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parental Rights
Personnel and Employment
Religion
Teachers